pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Voice of the Martyrs
CC50771
9429042666059
Registered

Registration details

13/11/2013
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 5482
Papanui
Christchurch
8542
Restricted

Charity's other details

03-3798-790

Africa

Chad

South America

Colombia

Asia

Afghanistan

Europe

Albania


Group Members


Below are all the members of VOM Ministries Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
The EPIC Foundation Limited
Voice of the Martyrs
VOM Ministries

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust's purpose is: * To show God's compassion by providing for the needs of the oppressed and relief of poverty * To serve God's churches by enabling them to survive persecution and its effects * To speak as God's advocates by educating christians in NZ about christian persecution * To share God's love by helping the persecuted church and bring to Christ those who are opposed to the Gospel * To spread God's word by supplying Bibles and literature to meet the need for growth and evangelism

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, International activities, Fund-raising

Religious groups

Other charities

Entity Structure

The Trust is a stand alone entity. The Board of Trustees is responsible for the administration, management and investment of the Trust funds.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
The EPIC Foundation Limited CC49549
VOM Ministries CC54131

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2020 Member of 'VOM Ministries Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2019 Member of 'VOM Ministries Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2018 20/02/2019 $684,489 $683,149
30/06/2017 21/02/2019 $638,910 $799,785
30/06/2016 4/10/2016 $728,206 $649,266
30/06/2015 8/06/2016 $589,135 $518,679
30/06/2014 5/09/2014 $655,983 $576,810

Officer Details


Restricted

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/01/2018 NOC005
29/12/2017 NOC004
24/02/2016 NOC002
24/02/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents