pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Diocese Of Dunedin
CC31504
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 13170
Green Island
Dunedin
9052
1A Howden Street
Green Island
Dunedin
9018

Charity's other details

03 488 0820


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Proclaiming the Gospel of Jesus Christ. Teaching, baptising and nurturing believers within Eucharistic communities of faith. Responding to human needs by loving service. Seeking to transform unjust structures of society, caring for God's creation, and establishing the values of the Kingdom.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Includes about thirty parishes in the Otago and Southland provinces, as well as social service agencies in Dunedin and Invercargill, rest homes, a psychogeriatric hospital, a girls' school and a University hall of residence.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Anglican Family Care Centre Incorporated CC24152
Dunedin Diocesan Trust Board CC36214
Earl Street Charitable Trust CC31963
Home of St Barnabas Trust CC23044
Leslie Groves Society of St John's (Roslyn) CC36222
North Otago Anglican Homes For The Aged Trust CC24248
Parata Anglican Charitable Trust CC22137
South Centre Anglican Care Trust (Southland) CC37176
St Hildas Collegiate School Incorporated CC34519
St Pauls Cathedral Foundation CC35974
Takitimu Home Anglican Care Trust CC25861

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2020 8/10/2020 $26,918,646 $24,382,352
30/09/2019 20/10/2019 $26,169,327 $23,433,339
30/09/2018 3/10/2018 $25,595,521 $22,506,037
30/06/2017 18/10/2017 $24,301,943 $21,795,721
30/06/2016 27/10/2016 $3,869,323 $4,007,447
30/06/2015 7/09/2015 $4,029,682 $4,075,238
30/06/2014 23/10/2014 $3,721,682 $3,560,178
30/06/2013 23/09/2013 $4,173,338 $4,113,849
30/06/2012 30/08/2012 $4,267,798 $3,889,604

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Gordon Curtis Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Brett John Roberts Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Diana Marie Abercrombie Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Dorothy Gray Muir Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Eric Anthony Kyte Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Keith John Gover Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Stephen Douglas Mitchell Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Elizabeth Cheyne Member Diocesan Council 11/06/2019
Steven Benford Chairperson 22/09/2017
Lisa Burton Member Diocesan Council 17/09/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrea McDougall Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Anne Gover Diocesan Council Member 12/09/2020
Fred McElrea Member DIocesan Council 12/09/2020
Lynda Turner-Heaton Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Trish Franklin Member Diocesan Council 12/09/2020
Gary Griffith-Smith Member Diocesan Council 3/07/2020
Max Whitaker Member Diocesan Council 13/08/2019
Joanna Fielding Member Diocesan Council 9/04/2019
Damon Plimmer Member Diocesan Council 22/09/2018
Kelvin Peter Wright Chairperson 17/04/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/10/2020 NOC016
21/09/2016 NOC011
23/09/2013 AR007
22/09/2013 NOC005
30/08/2012 AR006
26/07/2011 NOC004
28/07/2010 NOC003
27/06/2009 AR003
3/06/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents