pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Middlemore Foundation
The Middlemore Foundation
CC11382
9429042967286
Registered

Registration details

16/10/2007
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The South Auckland Health Foundation 17/10/2007
The Middlemore Foundation For Health Innovation 14/06/2012
The Middlemore Foundation 28/10/2020

Address for service

Private Bag 93320
Otahuhu
Auckland
1640
100 Hospital Road
Middlemore Hospital
Middlemore Hospital
Auckland
2024

Charity's other details

(09)2708808
(09)2704749


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Funding, enabling and facilitating programmes and partnerships for community health and well-being

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Fund-raising

Health

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public

Entity Structure

Charity

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 24/12/2020 $1,628,000 $1,685,000
31/12/2019 22/12/2019 $2,281,000 $3,028,000
31/12/2018 19/12/2018 $2,960,000 $69,000
31/12/2017 13/12/2017 $2,868,000 $2,409,000
31/12/2016 16/12/2016 $2,648,000 $2,205,000
31/12/2015 17/11/2015 $2,946,965 $2,853,968
31/12/2014 2/12/2014 $4,313,315 $3,344,660
31/12/2013 28/11/2013 $3,770,000 $4,042,000
31/12/2012 19/12/2012 $2,503,000 $2,683,000
31/12/2011 29/11/2011 $3,542,000 $2,950,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angela Lim Trustee 28/11/2019
Harry Chawla Trustee 28/11/2019
Lyn Lim Trustee 28/11/2019
Fepulea’i Margie Letaulau Apa Trustee 24/09/2018
Faye Langdon Trustee 22/09/2016
Ranjna Patel Trustee 30/05/2014
Nicholas Frederick Main Chairman 15/11/2012
Robert Anthony Fisher Deputy Chairman 15/11/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jatin Patel Trustee 2/12/2020
Joanne Parekawhia McLean Trustee 1/12/2020
Sarah Kennedy Trustee 1/12/2020
Margaret Ann White Trustee 30/11/2019
Phillip Norman Balmer Trustee 19/11/2018
Gloria Ann Johnson Trustee 3/09/2018
Ronald Athol Pearson Trustee 14/07/2017
Geraint Andrew Thomas Martin Trustee 18/05/2017
Nicola Marion Bell Trustee 20/07/2016
Rebecca Charlotte Lloyd Trustee 29/02/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/02/2020 NOC039
14/02/2019 NOC037
13/12/2018 NOC035
15/09/2017 NOC032
15/09/2017 NOC031
12/09/2017 NOC030
29/08/2016 NOC028
26/07/2016 NOC027
26/07/2016 NOC026
17/11/2015 NOC025

Charity Documents