pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sowers Trust
CC51243
9429043270163
Registered

Registration details

28/01/2015
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Sowers Community Services Trust 28/01/2015
Sowers Trust 13/03/2016

Address for service

PO Box 38360
Howick
Auckland
2145
120 Picton Street
Howick
Howick
Auckland
2014

Charity's other details

09-5380050


Group Members


Below are all the members of HCC Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Howick Community Church Trust
Picton Centre Trust
Sowers Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Sowers provides wrap around support to the community of Howick Ward and surrounding areas. Our key values are: FAITH : HOPE : COMPASSION : RESPECT We believe that everyone has a right to have their basic needs met, to be safe, to have access to and obtain an education. We believe that everyone has value and deserves the same opportunities in life. That sometimes a person’s environment or circumstances can get in the way of them dreaming and believing in a future full of hope. VISION: strong, confident families that are able to connect, contribute and thrive in their community. MISSION: To equip, empower and mentor young people and their families. Our AIM: to walk alongside individuals and their families, to identify their strengths and build resiliency through community connections. WHAT ARE OUR INTENDED OUTCOMES?

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Community services funded by combination of Govt and Community donations

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 Member of 'HCC Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'HCC Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'HCC Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'HCC Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'HCC Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'HCC Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 - - - - Exempt
31/12/2015 - - - - Exempt
31/12/2014 - - - - Exempt

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brian Payne Trustee 11/12/2019
Paul Gray Trustee 11/12/2019
Robyn Bailey Trustee 11/12/2019
Tracey Stevenson Trustee 27/10/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Wood Trustee 7/12/2020
David William Osborne Trustee 11/12/2019
Joanne Watkins Trustee 18/07/2019
Tania Milne Trustee 14/09/2017
Michael David Carter Trustee 5/06/2017
Philippa Jane Stubbins Trustee 3/11/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/01/2020 NOC016
11/12/2019 NOC015
5/08/2019 NOC014
3/03/2018 NOC010
15/09/2017 NOC008
6/06/2017 NOC007
13/07/2016 NOC005
13/07/2016 NOC004
22/03/2016 NOC003
19/11/2015 NOC002

Charity Documents