pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sports Chaplaincy New Zealand Charitable Trust
CC49430
9429043243716
Registered

Registration details

5/08/2013
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 13921
Onehunga
Auckland
1643
329B Onehunga Mall
Silverdale 0932
Onehunga
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

022 607 5878


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To identify, train, appoint, and guide dedicated chaplains to serve athletes and teams at all levels across New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Social services, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Sports Chaplaincy New Zealand Charitable Trust is a Not-For-Profit organisation governed by its Board of Trustees.  The Trust deed specifies that the Board of Trustees is to be comprised of at least three people (currently seven).  Within the Board, one Trustee is responsible for maintaining the accounting records of the Trust.  There are three paid employees of the Trust who are responsible for the day-to-day operations of the Trust with the remaining duties being done primarily by volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 5/09/2019 $328,487 $348,446
30/09/2018 6/09/2018 $326,920 $286,742
30/09/2017 19/09/2017 $270,694 $218,766
30/09/2016 1/09/2016 $203,126 $170,633
30/09/2015 3/08/2015 $102,487 $80,852
30/09/2014 8/10/2014 $52,701 $16,183

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Cyril Phillip Pawley Chief Executive Officer 26/02/2018
Martyn John Norrie Trustee 22/10/2013
Andrew Ross Kerr Trustee 19/03/2013
Grant Phillip Harris Trustee 19/03/2013
Kevin Raymond Prewett Trustee 19/03/2013
Melony Jane Clark Trustee 19/03/2013
Murray John Thatcher Trustee 19/03/2013
Ross Murray Georgiou Trustee 19/03/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/09/2018 NOC007
7/06/2018 NOC006
30/09/2015 NOC003
15/04/2014 NOC002
27/08/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents