pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Norah Howell Charitable Trust
CC31846
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 9495
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
LEVEL 3
18 London Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 838 2692
07 838 1667


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote assist and support any recognised charitable object or purpose in New Zealand with particular emphasis on the Hamilton and Waikato areas.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Care / protection of animals, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

A Board consisting of 3-7 trustees provides governance, making investment and funding decisions. Day-to-day management is in the hands of the chartered accountants, Cleland Hancox. Trustees are appointed by the two children of the Settlor. On their demise appointments will be made by a vote of the board with a three-quarters majority required.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $209,873 $150,717
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $208,096 $196,982
30/09/2016 20/09/2016 $262,309 $177,776
30/09/2015 16/09/2015 $241,896 $154,351
30/09/2014 11/09/2014 $204,967 $152,409
30/09/2013 20/09/2013 $227,770 $171,689
30/09/2012 6/08/2012 $263,631 $200,578
30/09/2011 5/10/2011 $266,221 $179,397
30/09/2010 1/10/2010 $256,876 $211,051
30/09/2009 30/09/2009 $132 $212

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rodney Gerald Carpinter Trustee 13/02/2018
Leean Georgia Bedwell Trustee 25/10/2016
Heather Jean Anderson Howell Trustee 1/12/2015
Cleland Hancox Limited Secretary 31/03/2012
Alison Harold Trustee 5/06/2009
David James Howell Trustee 18/05/2007
Anthony Cedric Howell Trustee 25/05/1984
Dennis Godrey Howell Trustee 25/05/1984

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Catherine Dollimore Trustee 30/06/2017
Yvonne Wilson Trustee 18/05/2016
Eleanor Tonkin Trustee 20/11/2015
Clive Basil Cleland Trustee 24/09/2015
Daphne Lois Bell Trustee 29/09/2010
Elizabeth Sheila Boyd Howell Trustee 31/12/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/06/2018 NOC012
5/06/2018 NOC011
9/12/2015 NOC008
1/12/2015 NOC007
2/08/2012 NOC004
5/10/2011 AR004
1/10/2010 AR003
30/09/2009 AR002
29/06/2009 NOC003
23/02/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents