pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Vanuatu Community Trust
CC43980
9429043205417
Registered

Registration details

12/04/2010
March 31

Address for service

18 Tyrico Close
Unsworth Heights
Auckland
0632

Charity's other details

021858502

Oceania

Vanuatu


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To Alleviate poverty in Vanuatu Communities. The trust will support local initiatives that assist in the relief of poverty and provision of basic needs such as water, food, shelter, health, natural disaster, economic development, education and social, environmental and spiritual well being of communities. The trust believes in self sustaining development that listens to local concerns, utilises local skills and resources. The trust believes that all people should be given opportunity to reach their God-given potential and will give assistance regardless of geographical setting, creed, gender or race. The trust may also undertake activities to educate New Zealand residents regarding issues facing Vanuatu communities and facilitate and provide the mechanism for active participation of residents in NZ with the work that the trust supports among Vanuatu communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, International activities

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

The Trust is run by the Trustees and other volunteers on a purely volunteer basis.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 9/10/2020 $8,860 $0
30/09/2019 1/12/2019 $13,965 $14,265
30/09/2018 17/02/2019 $8,505 $0
30/09/2017 17/02/2019 $7,500 $14,000
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $8,130 $12,696
30/09/2015 12/07/2015 $17,000 $7,000
30/09/2014 21/07/2014 $6,500 $12,000
30/09/2013 9/08/2013 $11,000 $7,000
30/09/2012 22/06/2012 $16,500 $18,500

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Daniel Leddy Trustee 29/09/2016
Laura Giddey Trustee 11/04/2014
Andrew John Finlay Trustee 23/03/2010
Heather Ann Ameye-Bevers Trustee 23/03/2010
Maxine Maree Finlay Trustee 23/03/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dennis Barber Trustee 29/09/2016
Carl William Becker Trustee 11/04/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/07/2016 NOC006
28/07/2015 NOC005
6/08/2014 NOC004
22/06/2012 AR003
8/07/2011 AR002
5/07/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents