pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Vector Group Charitable Trust (Envisioning Sustainable Communities Creatively)
Te Puke Youth and Community Centre
CC45966
9429045972324
Registered

Registration details

4/01/2011
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Vector Group Holdings Inc 5/01/2011
Vector Group Charitable Trust (Envisioning Sustainable Communities Creatively) 30/06/2017

Address for service

PO Box 225
Te Puke
3153

Charity's other details

0274144280
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/VectorGroupNZ
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/VectorGroupNZ
https://www.instagram.com/VectorGroupNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vector Group Charitable Trust supports Taiohi and Community led engagement and development. Our work is guided by our kaupapa and principles. Our kaupapa: Mō te oranga o ngā taiohi me ngā kaitiaki e mahi ana mō rātou. For the wellbeing of taiohi and the people who support them. Our values: • Kaitautoko kaiārahi/support and lead at the same time • Inclusive/embracing diversity • Responsive/evolving with the sector Vision: A community where diversity is celebrated, and every person feels included. Mission: To create opportunities for healthy connections and self-expression. To support people who work with young people, and thereby enhance youth engagement and development and creatives so that young people thrive. Strategic Programmes and Services: 1. Youth Development and Engagement 2. Community Activities and Engagement 3. Information Sharing 4. Supporting “Shared-Identity” Communities 5. Creative Projects that Enable Self-Expression

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Trust is governed by a Board of Trustees (no less than 2, no more than 5).  The Board elects from among itself a Chairperson.  A Secretary and Treasurer are appointed from among the Board or from non-Trust members. VGCT also operates alongside a discussion/strategy panel of between 5-13 youth and community members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2019 11/11/2019 $81,190 $75,342
30/09/2018 12/07/2019 $42,327 $44,453
30/09/2017 17/07/2019 $10,001 $6,459
30/09/2016 26/11/2017 $0 $0
30/09/2015 13/12/2016 $0 $0
30/09/2014 21/01/2015 $0 $0
30/09/2013 23/10/2013 $0 $0
30/09/2012 16/10/2012 $0 $0
30/09/2011 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Isaac Gunson Trustee 1/04/2019
Les White Trustee 1/04/2019
Parminder Kaur Trustee 1/04/2019
Tracey Anne Fawcett Trustee 10/10/2012
Steve Fawcett Trustee 5/01/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Geekiyanage Ayoma Subashini Fernando Trustee 30/04/2019
Dahl Gurdit-Singh Trustee 27/04/2017
Pauline Jacobs Trustee 10/10/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/02/2017 NOC008
27/02/2017 NOC007
31/01/2017 NOC006
13/12/2016 NOC005
7/11/2015 NOC004
23/10/2013 AR002
10/04/2013 NOC001
16/10/2012 AR001

Charity Documents