pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lindisfarne Proprietors Trust Board
Lindisfarne College
CC37498
9429042977155
Registered

Registration details

8/02/2009
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 2341
Stortford Lodge
Hastings
4153
600 Pakowhai Road
Frimley
Hastings
4120

Charity's other details

06 873 1136
06 878 6955


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The trust was established to carry out every charitable purpose in New Zealand whether relating to the advancement of education, the advancement of religion, or any other purpose beneficial to the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides religious services / activities, Funds for Education

Education / training / research

Community development, Religious activities

Children / young people

Religious groups

Entity Structure

A Charitable Trust which owns the property occupied by Lindisfarne College, together with boarding facilities to enable distant students to attend the school. The trustees are volunteers, but the Trust employs staff to run the hostel complex.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/07/2020 30/07/2020 $9,020,965 $8,414,398
30/06/2019 25/06/2019 $8,262,141 $7,935,717
30/06/2018 21/06/2018 $7,704,906 $7,501,520
30/06/2017 31/08/2017 $7,335,285 $7,157,357
30/06/2016 12/08/2016 $7,264,919 $6,856,619
30/06/2015 8/07/2015 $7,459,038 $7,216,065
30/06/2014 3/09/2014 $7,118,026 $6,629,229
30/06/2013 19/06/2013 $6,783,102 $6,102,145
30/06/2012 1/08/2012 $6,518,720 $5,890,881

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jacqueline Lilian Stafford Trustee 22/08/2019
Jillian Mary McDonald Trustee 22/08/2019
Sharon Mary Wards Trustee 22/08/2019
Barry Law Secretary 1/08/2013
Adrian Paul Skelton Trustee 30/09/2011
James Murdoch Syme Trustee 3/03/2008
John Stuart Wakeman Trustee 17/10/1998

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nolan Reginald Martin Trustee 30/09/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/08/2019 NOC007
20/10/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents