pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Resuscitation Council Incorporated
CC32727
9429042949862
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 10443
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
LEVEL 4 GLENEAGLES BUILDING
69-71 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

044996625
044996626
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/NZResusCouncil


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We seek all New Zealanders to have the best possible outcome from immediate threats to life and limb. We set the standards for resuscitation and first aid in New Zealand and promote high quality resuscitation practice through better informed education, better informed rescuers, and improved New Zealand standards.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The New Zealand Resuscitation Council is a national voluntary body with representation from 20 member organisations that are major providers of resuscitation. An elected Executive Committee overseas fiscal management and compliance with legislation. Dr Richard Aickin is the current Chair of the Council and Executive Committee.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 13/12/2018 $739,680 $744,978
31/12/2017 20/12/2017 $539,351 $472,610
31/12/2016 29/03/2017 $562,023 $600,405
31/12/2015 4/02/2016 $187,935 $331,131
31/12/2014 25/02/2015 $190,929 $278,137
31/12/2013 10/12/2013 $335,548 $291,170
31/12/2012 7/02/2013 $517,714 $409,169
31/12/2011 4/04/2012 $177,500 $208,000
31/12/2010 25/01/2011 $421,762 $311,826
30/11/2009 29/12/2009 $282,000 $209,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tonia Chrisular Jarrett Honorary Treasurer 6/11/2014
Kevin Nation Executive Officer 1/08/2007
Richard Aickin Chairman 1/01/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rob Frengley Deputy Chairman 5/11/2015
Duncan Galletly Deputy Chair 29/12/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/11/2015 NOC005
6/11/2015 NOC004
4/04/2012 AR004
29/12/2009 AR002

Charity Documents