pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


CrossNet Incorporated
CrossNet
CC52900
9429043294077
Registered

Registration details

22/09/2015
June 30

Address for service

Box 38-275
Howick
Auckland
2014
Unit R, 301 Botany Road
Golflands
Auckland
2013

Charity's other details

021 2472001
n/a
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/crossnetpage/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purposes of the Society are: a. To build a network of charitable community support; b. To facilitate community support programmes to provide a healthy and stable community. c. To run organised programmes designed to promote the holistic wellbeing of the community d. To form strategic partnerships with other organizations and individuals to increase effectiveness and to assist the society to achieve its purposes. e. To provide training, education and practical experience to students and interns seeking a career as a community worker. f. To be guided in all activities and initiatives by Christian Principles (see clause 12.a.v) and, where appropriate, to work in close partnership with local churches, and in particular Howick Community Church (HCC). g. To engage in appropriate commercial activities or Social Enterprises to create financial income to support the activities of the society. h. To raise funding by way of donations, sponsorship, legacies, and grants .

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Education / training / research, Social services, Employment, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

CrossNet is governed by a Board and daily management is provided by a full time contractor in the role of Community Team Leader.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 18/01/2018 $107,995 $108,668
31/12/2016 25/04/2017 $95,158 $65,667

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Barbara Carr Board Member 10/09/2015
Carolene Fife Secretary 10/09/2015
Dale Gordon Bradley Executive Chair 10/09/2015
Janice Kennington Board Member 10/09/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kirsty Coleman Secretary 31/03/2018
Graham Luey Board Member 29/10/2017
Mervyn Sandford Board Member 29/10/2017
Gary Stuart Carr Board Member 14/10/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/06/2018 NOC007
24/11/2017 NOC005
26/04/2017 NOC004
6/12/2016 NOC002
17/02/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents