pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Destiny Church Gisborne
CC31170
9429043107322
Deregistered
28/02/2010
They failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 42 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Destiny Church Gisborne at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

PO Box 508
Gisborne
4040
324 Kahutia Street
Gisborne
4010

Charity's other details

068684720
068684725


Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2010 - - - - To be filed
31/08/2009 - - - - To be filed

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brendon John Gerrard Trustee 1/03/2007
Tatum Joy Wainuiorangi Pare Gerrard Trustee 1/03/2007
Anthony Wayne Gair Trustee 1/11/2003
Eleanor Marie Gair Trustee 1/11/2003
Eunice Delena Maru Pene Trustee 1/11/2003
Te Rua Karaka Pita Te Omeka Pene Trustee 1/11/2003

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents