pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints Trust Board
CC31692
9429042616573
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints Trust Board 30/06/2008
The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints Trust Board 16/07/2020

Address for service

PO Box 33342
Takapuna
Auckland
0740
11-13 Huron Street
Takapuna
Auckland
0622

Charity's other details

09 488 2351
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/ChurchofJesusChristPacific


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To carry out all ecclesiastical and temporal activities of the Church in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Trust was created pursuant to a trust deed dated 9th May 1921 and was incorporated by a private act of the New Zealand parliament entitled the "Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints Empowering" Act (1957/1). the Trust is a charitable trust incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957, and registered under the Charities Act 2005, and therefore is exempt from income tax.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2020 29/06/2020 $116,064,000 $73,038,000
30/06/2019 28/06/2019 $80,276,000 $70,715,000
30/06/2018 28/06/2018 $95,383,000 $64,997,000
30/06/2017 30/07/2017 $106,666,000 $68,756,000
30/06/2016 28/06/2016 $84,893,000 $60,434,000
30/06/2015 16/10/2015 $87,651,000 $60,621,000
30/06/2014 11/09/2014 $69,335,000 $58,875,000
30/06/2013 16/07/2013 $47,716,000 $54,040,000
30/06/2012 26/09/2012 $51,952,000 $52,156,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Steven K. Peterson Trustee and Chairman 15/06/2018
David Clarke Trustee 28/05/2013
Richard Hunter Trustee 28/05/2013
Albert Niuelua Trustee 1/12/2009
Richard Allen Chadderton Trustee 10/02/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Brent L. Buckner Chairman, Director for Temporal Affairs. 14/06/2018
Terry Oakes Chairman and Trustee 1/12/2014
Ngawati Smiler Trustee 28/05/2013
Paul Ross Coward Chair 11/05/2012
Lee Lomax Trustee 27/04/2012
Renwick Kalei Decaires Trustee 31/12/2009
Clinton Reed Gurney Trustee 10/02/2009
Newman Soloai Trustee 10/02/2009
Wayne Jeffrey Pemberton Trustee 10/02/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/08/2020 NOC019
16/07/2020 NOC018
7/07/2020 NOC017
2/06/2020 NOC015
11/10/2018 NOC013
3/07/2018 NOC012
10/04/2015 NOC009
12/07/2013 AR007
26/09/2012 AR006
16/06/2011 AR005

Charity Documents