pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints Trust Board
CC31692
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 33342
Takapuna
Auckland
740
11-13 Huron Street
Takapuna
Auckland
622

Charity's other details

09 488 2350

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To carry out all ecclesiastical and temporal activities of the Church in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Trust was created pursuant to a trust deed dated 9th May 1921 and was incorporated by a private act of the New Zealand parliament entitled the "Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints Empowering" Act (1957/1). the Trust is a charitable trust incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957, and registered under the Charities Act 2005, and therefore is exempt from income tax.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/06/2017 30/07/2017 $106,666,000 $68,756,000
30/06/2016 28/06/2016 $84,893,000 $60,434,000
30/06/2015 16/10/2015 $87,651,000 $60,621,000
30/06/2014 11/09/2014 $69,335,000 $58,875,000
30/06/2013 16/07/2013 $47,716,000 $54,040,000
30/06/2012 26/09/2012 $51,952,000 $52,156,000
30/06/2011 16/06/2011 $58,494,000 $50,725,000
30/06/2010 29/07/2010 $69,929,000 $48,920,000
30/06/2009 30/07/2009 $72,406,740 $78,782,701

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brent L. Buckner Chairman, Director for Temporal Affairs. 2/12/2014
David Clarke Trustee 28/05/2013
Richard Hunter Trustee 28/05/2013
Albert Niuelua Trustee 1/12/2009
Richard Allen Chadderton Trustee 10/02/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Terry Oakes Chairman and Trustee 1/12/2014
Ngawati Smiler Trustee 28/05/2013
Paul Ross Coward Chair 11/05/2012
Lee Lomax Trustee 27/04/2012
Renwick Kalei Decaires Trustee 31/12/2009
Clinton Reed Gurney Trustee 10/02/2009
Newman Soloai Trustee 10/02/2009
Wayne Jeffrey Pemberton Trustee 10/02/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/04/2015 NOC009
12/07/2013 AR007
26/09/2012 AR006
16/06/2011 AR005
29/07/2010 AR004
12/05/2010 NOC003
3/08/2009 NOC002
30/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents