pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


U3A Manawatu Incorporated
U3A Manawatu, University of the Third Age Manawatu
CC46297
9429043069590
Registered

Registration details

8/03/2011
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 9076
Terrace End
Palmerston North
4441
18 Wikiriwhi Crescent
Terrace End
Awapuni
Palmerston North
4412

Charity's other details

06 353 0586


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(a) To provide community education and learning for members in accordance with the principles of the U3A movement. There are no entry qualifications and no certificates of achievement will be issued. (b) To conduct all other business of U3A.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Education / training / research

Older people

General public

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society registered under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908 and its amendments. Also holds charitable status with the Charities Commission.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2012.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 19/10/2020 $6,951 $4,533
31/12/2019 15/10/2019 $6,551 $6,752
31/12/2018 9/10/2018 $7,370 $6,667
31/12/2017 10/10/2017 $8,732 $7,597
31/12/2016 24/09/2016 $6,517 $5,882
31/12/2015 24/10/2015 $6,767 $5,294
31/12/2014 13/09/2014 $7,005 $6,514
31/12/2013 23/10/2013 $7,697 $6,222
31/12/2012 2/10/2012 $4,282 $5,127
31/12/2011 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sally Merle Smillie Committee Member 18/09/2019
Christopher Henry Edwin Phillips Committee Member 12/09/2018
Janet Selina Black Committee Member 12/09/2018
Keith Stuart Birks Committee Member 12/09/2018
Graham Leslie Slater Chairperson 23/09/2016
Rosemary Frances Krsinich Secretary 11/07/2016
Stuart Charles Schwartz Committee Member 14/10/2013
Ronald Colin Paddock Treasurer 18/09/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Larry Haist Committee Member 15/09/2020
Cherry Lynne Gordon Committee Member 18/09/2019
Beverley Charlton Committee Member 12/09/2018
Carol Phillips Chairperson 12/09/2018
Jennifer Ann Edwards Treasurer 28/05/2018
Julie Broadhead Treasurer 20/09/2017
Alison Fraser committee member 21/09/2016
Michael Carter Secretary 11/07/2016
Margaret Hazelton committee member 7/12/2015
Eugene Waldteufel Committee Member 23/09/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/10/2020 NOC022
15/10/2019 NOC020
13/10/2018 NOC019
2/07/2017 NOC016
20/06/2017 NOC015
20/06/2017 NOC014
18/04/2017 NOC013
24/09/2016 NOC012
4/08/2016 NOC009
20/07/2016 NOC008

Charity Documents