pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Digital Future Aotearoa
Code Club Aotearoa
CC51617
9429043268764
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Code Club Charitable Trust 1/04/2015
Code Club Charitable Trust 26/04/2015
Digital Future Aotearoa 7/08/2018

Registration details

1/04/2015
March 31

Address for service

4 Ash Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide free education to New Zealand students in the area of computer science and digital technologies.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/10/2018 27/10/2018 $165,385 $79,365
30/09/2017 27/09/2017 $142,939 $150,617
30/09/2016 28/10/2016 $92,311 $48,341

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Samuel White Trustee 28/03/2017
Kris David Morrison Trustee 3/11/2016
Victoria MacLennan Trustee 3/11/2016
Michael Trengrove Trustee 19/03/2015
Timothy Clinton Bell Trustee 19/03/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Simon David Worthington Trustee 31/08/2018
Rachael Cotton-Bronte Trustee 29/08/2017
Michelle Emma Dickinson Trustee 27/06/2017
Bryn Howell Lewis Trustee 30/06/2016
Paul Matthews Trustee 30/06/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/09/2017 NOC012
7/08/2017 NOC011
18/04/2017 NOC010
11/04/2017 NOC009
15/11/2016 NOC008
15/11/2016 NOC007
15/11/2016 NOC006
21/09/2016 NOC003
5/08/2016 NOC002
9/06/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents