pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Destiny International Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Destiny International Trust
Te Hahi o Nga Matamua Holdings Limited

Group Details


Destiny International Group

Registration details

Registered
19/02/2017
CC54178
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 76433
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
25 Druces Road
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Group's other details

095707150
095707149


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2017 9/01/2018 $2,136,828 $2,279,234
30/09/2016 3/11/2017 $2,073,789 $4,877,074

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Destiny International Group provides support, expertise, training, and property development for all of our Destiny Churches Internationally.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Employment, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Children / young people

Entity Structure

Destiny International Trust owns 100% shareholding in our charitable company Te Hahi o nga Matamua Holdings Limited.

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents