Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary

Charity Details

English Language Partners New Zealand Trust

Registration details

December 31

Address for service

PO Box 12114
192 Tinakori Road

Charity's other details

04 471 2382
04 471 2383

Purpose & Structure

Charitable Purpose

English Language Tuition to Adult Refugees and Migrants with English as their second language

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research


Migrants / refugees

Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns

Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/06/2017 27/06/2017 $9,765,043 $9,103,956
30/06/2016 24/05/2016 $8,944,297 $8,465,811
30/06/2015 23/06/2015 $8,667,413 $8,047,215

Officer Details


Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anne Therese Alkema Trustee 22/05/2017
Kararaina Scally-Irvine Trustee 22/05/2017
David Bromell Trustee 1/06/2015
Gillian Brookes Trustee 1/06/2015
Amit Prasad Trustee 27/09/2014
Catherine Neill Trustee 27/09/2014
Gurbrinder Aulakh Chairperson 27/09/2014
Lloyd Davies Trustee 27/09/2014
Praful Rambhai Trustee 27/09/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alasdair Finnie Trustee 24/05/2017
Simon Park Trustee 1/09/2015
Christine Cody Trustee 1/06/2015
Gillian Cook Trustee 1/06/2015
Rong (Rhonda) Lin Trustee 1/06/2015

Charity Updates

Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/05/2017 NOC004
15/10/2015 NOC003
21/07/2015 NOC002
23/06/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents