pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of The Salvation Army New Zealand Group.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
The Booth College of Mission Foundation Fund
The Edmund and Maud Sanderson Jeff Charitable Trust
The Salvation Army New Zealand
The Salvation Army New Zealand Trust

Group Details


The Salvation Army New Zealand Group

Registration details

Registered
30/06/2008
CC37322
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 6015
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
202-204 Cuba Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Group's other details

04 382 0738
04 802 6258

Oceania

Fiji, Samoa, Tonga


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 23/12/2020 $195,645,000 $171,108,000
31/12/2019 20/12/2019 $168,111,000 $163,221,000
31/12/2018 20/12/2018 $161,219,000 $148,376,000
31/12/2017 21/12/2017 $144,162,000 $132,881,000
31/12/2016 22/12/2016 $151,039,000 $131,767,000
31/12/2015 21/12/2015 $170,625,000 $148,702,000
31/12/2014 18/12/2014 $163,414,000 $148,946,000
31/12/2013 23/12/2013 $168,727,000 $143,938,000
31/12/2012 19/12/2012 $141,872,000 $138,307,000
31/12/2011 20/12/2011 $156,218,000 $134,137,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Salvation Army is an international movement and an evangelical branch of the Christian Church, which expresses its ministry through a balance of spiritual and social programmes. In its founding it was mobilised by God, and in its continuance is totally dependent on Him for the power to fulfil its calling. Everything it does is as an offering to the glory of God and for the worship and adoration of His Name. The mission of The Salvation Army in New Zealand, Fiji, Tonga and Samoa is caring for people, transforming lives and reforming society through God in Christ by the Holy Spirit's power.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups, Children / young people

Entity Structure

The Salvation Army New Zealand encompasses all activities of The Salvation Army in New Zealand and is administered under powers of attorney issued by ‘The General of The Salvation Army’ being a corporation sole under the terms of The Salvation Army Act 1980 (United Kingdom). The Salvation Army Group, consists of The Salvation Army New Zealand and its controlled entities (together The Salvation Army), The Salvation Army New Zealand Trust, the Booth College of Mission Fund and the Jeff Farm Trust

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/12/2012 AR005
20/12/2011 AR004
15/12/2009 AR002

Group Documents