pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Trinitarian Bible Society New Zealand Incorporated
Trinitarian Bible Society New Zealand
CC10651
9429042941040
Registered

Registration details

17/07/2007
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 137025
Parnell
Auckland
1151

Charity's other details

09 263 5919
02825507341
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/TePaiperaTapu1868/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trinitarian Bible Society was founded in 1831 with the principal aim of promoting the Glory of God and the Increase of His Kingdom through the circulation of Protestant or uncorrupted versions of the Word of God. Today, we still carry forward that vision, which is so well expressed in our Motto, The Word of God Among All Nations.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Free distribution of religious material worldwide

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development

Religious groups

Children / young people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

A self-perpetuating body.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2020 21/09/2020 $35,995 $27,792
30/06/2019 30/06/2019 $36,219 $50,865
30/06/2018 21/07/2018 $20,476 $25,896
30/06/2017 23/06/2017 $26,775 $30,338
30/06/2016 18/06/2016 $35,063 $56,718
30/06/2015 15/08/2015 $22,611 $18,661
30/06/2014 26/06/2014 $24,333 $43,531
30/06/2013 15/05/2013 $66,724 $40,208
30/06/2012 9/02/2012 $37,696 $70,834

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dominique Fanfulla Board member 23/06/2017
John Geuse Board member 9/03/2013
Justus Verheij Board member 19/03/2011
Berend De Boer Chairman 16/03/2008
Arie Verhij Vice chairman 9/05/2007
Paul De Bruin Secretary 9/05/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dirk Peter Vermeulen Trustee/Board member 20/12/2018
Uilke Haringa Secretary 15/09/2017
Peter Vermeulen Board Member 22/03/2014
Arnaud Vergunst Board Member 9/03/2013
Robert Arnold Hay Board Member 1/09/2010
Nicholas Bertram Board Member 1/11/2009
Alasdair Campbell Board Member 31/12/2007

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/06/2019 NOC009
23/03/2013 AR005
19/09/2012 NOC003
23/05/2012 NOC002
18/05/2011 AR003
4/02/2009 AR002

Charity Documents