pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Sir George Elliot Charitable Trust
CC21250
9429042888673
Registered

Registration details

18/02/2008
March 31

Address for service

C/- MARTELLI MCKEGG PO Box 5745
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
Martelli McKegg Lawyers
Level 20, 188 Quay Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

(09)970 2752
(09)309 4112


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Sir George Elliot Charitable Trust's purpose is to award three scholarships per year to young scholars who will go on to contribute to the well-being of the community in a wide range of spheres. Over the years the trust has supported many different community initiatives and projects, including development of local hospices, provision of facilities for the care of the elderly and community facilities such as halls and large theatre complexes. The trust also remains committed to education in a way which balances that with community objectives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Education / training / research

Health, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

Older people, General public

Entity Structure

Registered Charitable Trust Incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957 on the 6th day of March 1995. The Trust has one Chairman, five Trustees, Trust Solicitor and Secretary who attend Trustee meetings.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 30/09/2020 $701,070 $1,086,955
30/09/2019 1/10/2019 $394,217 $207,077
30/09/2018 1/10/2018 $320,391 $197,257
30/09/2017 29/11/2017 $386,984 $219,781
30/09/2016 15/12/2016 $286,614 $182,553
30/09/2015 13/11/2015 $238,536 $197,717
30/09/2014 15/12/2014 $204,186 $288,704
30/09/2013 10/12/2013 $229,390 $182,464
30/09/2012 19/12/2012 $247,200 $234,462

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lynette Yvonne Adams Trustee 11/03/2021
Bronwyn Sarah Heath Trustee 6/03/2020
Margaret Joy Eaton Trustee 17/10/2019
Hamish David McCarroll Trustee 9/12/2016
Stephen Dermot Gerard Corbett Trustee 12/02/2010
William Alexander Cavin Trustee 25/07/2008
Geoffrey Denis Clews Trustee/Chairman 19/02/2008
Stuart Alan Middleton Trustee 19/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richard Ian Barker Trustee 11/03/2021
Neha Patel Trustee 6/03/2020
Linda Fox Trustee 27/04/2018
Owen Erle Hoskin Trustee 25/07/2008
John Robert Archibald Trustee 11/04/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/03/2021 NOC017
26/03/2021 NOC016
12/02/2020 NOC014
2/05/2018 NOC011
15/02/2017 NOC009
19/12/2012 AR005
12/01/2011 NOC004
25/09/2008 NOC003
6/05/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents