pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Destiny School
CC30131
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 76201
Manukau
Auckland
2241
25 Druces Road
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

095277312
095707149


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

This ambitious model of education is designed to offer Maori and Pasifika tamariki and rangatahi a holistic and quality education in a deliberately academic environment. Alongside the academic curriculum the School delivers a Tripartite Education Programme, at all year levels. This transformational curriculum offers the School’s students spiritual, social, emotional and character development as well as leadership training, entrepreneurial training and financial literacy.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Health, Community development, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Destiny School Trust sought registration for Destiny School, as a Private coeducational facility, in 2002. The Destiny School Trustees form the Board of Governors. This body oversees the schools educational obligations to the ministry, the financial running of the school and the special character. The Destiny Board supports the Management and Staff with the day to day running of the school, networking with other schools and liaising with the parent community.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/06/2018 29/06/2018 $993,413 $941,543
30/06/2017 30/06/2017 $933,789 $944,855
30/06/2016 21/07/2016 $998,256 $1,013,506
30/06/2015 30/06/2015 $946,435 $1,189,628
30/06/2014 23/12/2014 $814,564 $908,174
30/06/2013 2/10/2014 $982,507 $1,111,190
30/06/2012 2/08/2012 $1,047,116 $945,523
30/06/2011 12/07/2011 $624,690 $640,349
30/06/2010 21/07/2010 $467,769 $470,224

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Frances Anne Williamson Director 22/07/2016
David Lawrence, Hohepa Kahu Trustee 1/01/2014
Jamie Aroha Warren Trustee 12/07/2012
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Director 6/01/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Frances Anne Williamson Manager 21/09/2015
Terence Paul Senior Principal 1/01/2014
Brodie John Seymour Parent Representative 12/07/2012
Dehana Marie Sargeant Financial Officer 12/07/2012
Jean Pearl Hunt Finance officer 26/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/08/2016 NOC009
28/10/2015 NOC008
18/03/2015 NOC007
1/05/2014 NOC006
12/09/2012 NOC001
21/07/2010 AR004
26/06/2009 AR002

Charity Documents