pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Unions Aotearoa International Development Trust
UnionAID
CC40251
Registered

Registration details

23/04/2009
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 6689
Marion Square
Wellington
6141
178-182 Willis Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

043822747

Oceania

Fiji

Asia

Burma (Myanmar), India, Thailand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The advancement of education and relief of poverty.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

International activities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Employment, Economic development, Fund-raising

Other (please state)

(Low Paid Workers), Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people

Entity Structure

Unions Aotearoa International Development Trust is a charitable trust. It fundraises and seeks donations in New Zealand that are applied to development projects run by partner organisations in developing countries.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2017 23/05/2018 $433,361 $462,458
30/09/2016 18/10/2016 $478,189 $507,115
30/09/2015 10/01/2016 $527,761 $541,321
30/09/2014 29/09/2014 $129,244 $124,249
30/09/2013 4/09/2013 $315,814 $267,889
30/09/2012 6/12/2012 $271,579 $242,754
30/09/2011 17/01/2012 $362,821 $286,660
30/09/2010 10/08/2010 $109,313 $20,170

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jacqueline Parisi Trustee 7/12/2016
Samuel Huggard Trustee 10/03/2015
Nanette Cormack Trustee 10/12/2014
Mary-jane Rivers Trustee 1/12/2010
James Ross Wilson Trustee 1/04/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter Lindsay Conway Trustee 9/06/2015
Helen Margaret Kelly Trustee 10/03/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/04/2017 NOC008
14/09/2016 NOC006
15/08/2012 AR004
17/01/2012 NOC003
17/01/2012 AR003
10/08/2010 AR002
10/08/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents