pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Helen Clark Foundation
CC55256
9429046602633
Registered

Registration details

14/12/2017
March 31

Address for service

P O Box 56 014
Dominion Road Post Office
Mt Eded
Auckland
1446
4 Cromwell Street
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

+6421348659
Facebook icon image
@helenclarkfoundation
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/HelenClarkFound?lang=en
https://www.linkedin.com/company/the-helen-clark-foundation/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

1. To fund/co-ordinate projects: (a) for the betterment of the physical, or educational wellbeing of NZ residents; (b) to protect/sustain the NZ environment; (c) to seek solutions for social/economic problems within NZ. 2. To fund/facilitate research and projects that will benefit NZ residents and the NZ environment. 3. To establish scholarship programmes & learning centres to encourage NZ children and young persons to develop skills.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation, Community development

General public

Entity Structure

A Trust Deed governed by 4 trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 1/11/2020 $255,624 $203,773
30/09/2019 19/08/2019 $116,660 $43,995
30/09/2018 12/08/2018 $28,596 $1,053

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Geoffrey Stewart Pownall Trustee 11/12/2017
Peter Byard Davis Trustee 11/12/2017
Simon Robert Mitchell Trustee 11/12/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Cynthia Alcyion Kiro Trustee 28/02/2021
Joan Patricia Caulfield Trustee 16/04/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/04/2021 NOC005

Charity Documents