pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Inter School Chess Charitable Trust Board
CC47098
9429043000494
Registered

Registration details

25/07/2011
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 7641
Sydenham
Christchurch
8240
149 Strickland Street
Spreydon
Christchurch
8024

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Establish, promote, develop and encourage chess as an educational sporting pursuit for school aged children in Canterbury, New Zealand. This includes running inter school chess competitions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Sport / recreation

Education / training / research, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The trustees volunteer their time to meet the Trust s purposes in conjunction with local schools and chess clubs. The main source of income is from participation fees which is used to cover operational costs and purchase additional equipment.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 8/04/2018 $4,560 $3,338
30/09/2017 28/08/2017 $3,815 $2,510
30/09/2016 28/08/2017 $2,625 $2,079
30/09/2015 4/03/2016 $2,150 $2,378
30/09/2014 4/03/2016 $2,125 $1,779
30/09/2013 24/09/2013 $2,380 $2,148
30/09/2012 28/09/2012 $1,305 $1,430

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Craig Hall Secretary 21/02/2016
Rebecca Dent Trustee 22/03/2014
Martin Lukes Trustee 30/04/2013
Clinton Rains Treasurer 25/07/2011
Jacinta Buist Chairperson 4/11/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Annette Rains Trustee 1/10/2018
Simon Ward Trustee 16/09/2018
Wayne Pearce Trustee 21/02/2016
Alister Ferguson - 30/04/2013
Shirley Scott - 31/12/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/10/2018 NOC013
7/10/2018 NOC012
17/09/2018 NOC011
7/07/2018 NOC010
31/07/2016 NOC006
21/07/2016 NOC005
21/07/2016 NOC004
26/03/2014 NOC003
19/09/2013 AR002
28/09/2012 AR001

Charity Documents