pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


McGuinness Institute Limited
CC21440
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Sustainable Future Limited 28/02/2008
McGuinness Institute Limited 22/02/2012

Registration details

27/02/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 24222
Manners Street
Wellington
6142
LEVEL 2
5 Cable Street
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)4998888
(04)3859884


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A non-partisan think tank working towards a sustainable future, contributing foresight through evidence-based research and policy analysis

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Chief Executive is Wendy McGuinness. Reporting to the CE is the Head of Research, Head of Events Management, Head of Design and Head of Administration. There are between 7 and 15 staff employed by the Institute at any one time.
The McGuinness Foundation Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual reutn by 30 September 2008 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 17/09/2018 $689,426 $723,548
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $528,221 $545,670
30/09/2016 30/06/2016 $586,941 $579,937
30/09/2015 16/07/2015 $582,412 $560,588
30/09/2014 19/09/2014 $489,172 $565,621
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $450,225 $551,989
30/09/2012 28/09/2012 $599,118 $530,149
30/09/2011 28/09/2011 $211,438 $570,822
30/09/2010 15/09/2010 $693,000 $471,000
30/09/2009 22/07/2009 $764,000 $436,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Wendy Louise McGuinness Director 14/09/2007

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/08/2013 AR006
21/03/2012 NOC002
22/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents