pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


NPH New Zealand Charitable Trust Board
NPH New Zealand
CC48254
9429043304462
Registered

Registration details

31/07/2012
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 9405
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
Level 3, 4 Gillies Avenue
Newmarket
Auckland
1023

Charity's other details

09 2160635
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/nphnewzealand

South America

Bolivia, Peru

North America

Dominican Republic, El Salvador, Guatemala, Haiti, Honduras, Mexico, Nicaragua


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of this charitable trust is to: - Provide financial and other support to vulnerable children, families and communities who live in conditions of extreme poverty; - Raise funds for programmes and facilities which help vulnerable children, families and communities who live in conditions of extreme poverty; - Educate New Zealanders on the issues of poverty and children's rights and provide meaningful and appropriate volunteer and visitor opportunities for New Zealanders who support NPH.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Children / young people

Older people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

NPH New Zealand trustees are a small group of very active, dedicated people who have ample knowledge and experience in their respective fields. The Director manages the fundraising programme and the volunteers. NPH New Zealand is made up of 45 part-time volunteers who help with fundraising events and administration.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 15/09/2021 $330,501 $329,619
30/09/2020 31/08/2020 $325,811 $361,974
30/09/2019 20/09/2019 $281,137 $284,898
30/09/2018 16/09/2018 $268,528 $275,056
30/09/2017 15/11/2017 $216,637 $140,092
30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $98,894 $124,801
30/09/2015 13/12/2015 $180,999 $138,883
30/09/2014 26/08/2014 $109,688 $38,229
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $102,248 $58,654

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jonathan Gabriel Treasurer 22/04/2021
Adrianne Walker Trustee 29/03/2016
Lisa Marie Richan Trustee 15/02/2014
Miguel Angel Venegas Lopez Trustee 21/06/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kristina Letetia Frances Cavit Trustee 1/07/2017
Brian Richard FitzGerald Trustee 1/01/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/05/2021 NOC010
5/07/2017 NOC005
22/03/2016 NOC003
1/10/2014 NOC002
29/09/2013 AR001

Charity Documents