pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rapid Relief Team (RRT) NZ Limited
RRT NZ
CC53659
9429042220022
Registered

Registration details

8/07/2016
March 31

Address for service

P O Box 5206
Terrace End
Palmerston North
4441
5 Noel Rodgers Place
Milson
Palmerston North
4414

Charity's other details

0800 100 972
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/RRTNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charitable purpose of RRT is set out in clause 5 of the Constitution: the relief of such poverty, sickness, suffering, distress, misfortune, disability, destitution or helplessness as arouses pity or compassion in the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(RRT offers quality catering assistance to charitable and government organisations confronting some of life's greatest challenges, including emergencies, homelessness, youth, health and disability.)

Other (please state)

(We have four areas of focus: Emergency/Disaster relief, Health and Disability, as well as Homelessness and Youth)

Other (please state)

(Children/youth, persons with health or disability challenges, homeless persons, those affected by disasters and emergency personnel are all supported through various organisations and charities. )

Entity Structure

RRT is managed by a Board of Directors and is supported by a devoted team of regional team leaders. We have a network of volunteer support personnel with dedicated responsibilities; such as facilities coordinator, labour coordinator etc. See organisation chart that appears at http://www.rapidreliefteam.org/wp-content/uploads/2013/11/raprel-. RRT teams around the globe are structured along similar lines to ensure uniformity in our offering to the community.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 27/09/2018 $395,822 $282,590
30/09/2017 22/12/2017 $682,377 $404,608

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kingsley Clement Smith Director 12/10/2018
Cameron James Prestidge Director 8/03/2016
Daniel Richard Blampied Director 8/03/2016
Daniel John Steele Director 8/03/2016
Edward Mark Davis Director 8/03/2016
Jeffrey Kelvin Wearmouth Director 8/03/2016
John Gilbert Hewetson Director 8/03/2016
Matthew Derek Smith Director 8/03/2016
Milton John How Director 8/03/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Jeremy Anderson Director 3/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/01/2019 NOC004
21/12/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents