pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Therapy Box
CC52617
Registered

Registration details

16/11/2015
July 31

Address for service

325 Hobsonville Road
Hobsonville
Auckland
0618

Charity's other details

0800153658
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/thetherapybox/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Formed in 2015, The Therapy Box operates New Zealand's first activity library for adults in care. Our vision is that adults receiving care are having fun and engaging with their community. Our mission is to provide fun and therapeutic activities to enhance well-being.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Providing low cost 'Activity Kits'

Health

Education / training / research, People with disabilities

Older people

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The Therapy Box is run by a small team of volunteers consisting of 4 board members and two activity makers. The Governance team is responsible for the guidance of strategic direction.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/01/2018 28/01/2018 $3,603 $4,993
31/01/2017 12/12/2016 $2,472 $229

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sophia Peiyun Lee-Miller Marketing Officer 24/07/2018
Sean Carney Treasurer 21/09/2017
Lawrence Bailey Vice Chairperson 27/08/2017
Anneliese Sabrowski Secretary 14/07/2016
Hannah Young Chairperson 5/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Melissa Jackson Treasurer 27/08/2017
Cara Venter Trustee 14/07/2016
Clare Arnold Executive Officer 14/07/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/08/2018 NOC011
11/05/2018 NOC010
11/05/2018 NOC009
13/10/2017 NOC007
29/08/2017 NOC006
20/06/2017 NOC005
25/07/2016 NOC003
14/07/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents