pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Destiny Church Nelson
CC29107
9429042986553
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

PO Box 423
Nelson
7040
75 Pascoe Street
Annesbrook
Nelson
7011

Charity's other details

035486555
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/destinychurchnelson/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To build a large church that is a blessing to the people of Nelson, providing spiritual, relational and practical help to all age groups, all ethnicities and cultures. To help feed the hungry, provide clothing, furniture and practical life assistance. To provide counselling and support to overcome addictions, domestic violence, relational problems and to provide programmes to up-skill people and enhance life skills.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The Trustees oversee the financial operating and management as well as the staffing of all services to the community. The different services are overseen by a team leader and an assistant, with a team under their guidance. The teams are accountable to their team leaders, who are accountable to the trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2018 31/08/2018 $534,820 $559,721
31/08/2017 30/08/2017 $521,284 $525,326
31/08/2016 27/08/2016 $469,566 $469,459
31/08/2015 27/08/2015 $454,175 $475,259
31/08/2014 5/10/2014 $458,468 $469,359
31/08/2013 31/08/2013 $484,418 $510,062
31/08/2012 30/08/2012 $500,339 $520,552
31/08/2011 29/08/2011 $487,601 $531,287
31/08/2010 23/11/2010 $526,237 $536,052
31/08/2009 15/01/2010 $510,011 $578,131

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Warren Grubham Trustee 1/06/2013
Sarah Daly Pastor 1/11/2007
Sharyn Rouse Trustee 17/10/2002
Martin Daly Senior Pastor 5/12/2001

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Darren Casey Trustee 1/03/2014
Catherine Mary Takiwa Trustee 1/06/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/08/2015 NOC005
31/08/2013 AR006

Charity Documents