pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


BotanyLife Community Trust
CC28770
Registered

Registration details

1/01/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 58375
Botany
Auckland
2163
272E TI Rakau Drive
Burswood
Auckland
2013

Charity's other details

(09)274 4242

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To facilitate the improvement of the social, cultural, spiritual and economic lives of the people of the community using an holistic approach and to provide an avenue for practical service primarily in the Botany-Clevedon, Howick, Pakuranga and Otara wards of Manukau City, as well as other neighbouring areas, but at all times within New Zealand

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Social services, Sport / recreation, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Incorporated Charitable Trust
BotanyLife Community Church Incorporated

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/06/2017 31/08/2017 $205,676 $155,689
30/06/2016 17/05/2016 $280,280 $132,546
30/06/2015 18/03/2015 $258,757 $126,014
30/06/2014 19/03/2014 $285,628 $137,529
30/06/2013 5/06/2013 $33,143 $31,336
30/06/2012 22/06/2012 $27,006 $30,836
30/06/2011 21/06/2011 $19,581 $23,078
30/06/2010 30/06/2010 $230,619 $18,626
30/06/2009 5/06/2009 $180,317 $7,875

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Curtis Mountfort Chairperson 19/02/2013
Liesl Francine Kenrick Trustee 29/11/2007
Mark Van Wijk Trustee 29/11/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Drew Palmer Trustee 13/06/2017
Mandy Francis Trustee 2/05/2017
Shona Janeen Manihera Trustee 19/02/2013
Neil Jason Blizard Treasurer 23/02/2012
Andrew Brent Creahan Chairman 2/07/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/08/2017 NOC007
19/03/2014 NOC006
23/02/2013 NOC001
12/06/2012 AR005
21/06/2011 AR004
30/06/2010 AR003

Charity Documents