pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Rape Crisis Incorporated
CC22397
Registered

Registration details

1/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 11731
Manners Street
Wellington
6142
Level 2
203 Willis Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 801 8970
04 801 8974
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/wrchopeheroes/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/WgtnRapeCrisis


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary aim of Wellington Rape Crisis shall be, within Aotearoa, to create a world free of rape and sexual abuse by educating others to prevent rape and sexual abuse, and by providing specialist support services to survivors and those who support them in a way that is feminist, informed, sustainable and holistic.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Women & gender minorities)

Entity Structure

Wellington Rape Crisis is an incorporated society and has a Governance Group Management structure. This includes a chair, secretary, treasurer, agency manager, staff and volunteers.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 17/08/2018 $540,358 $514,577
30/09/2017 5/09/2017 $534,522 $461,067
30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $464,450 $417,914
30/09/2015 4/11/2015 $362,317 $345,322
30/09/2014 8/04/2015 $260,036 $307,459
30/09/2013 24/09/2013 $419,952 $301,285
30/09/2012 27/08/2012 $244,186 $272,747
30/09/2011 27/09/2011 $220,706 $281,142
30/09/2010 14/10/2010 $211,437 $205,858
30/09/2009 15/10/2009 $234,190 $183,022

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anita Margaret Ranui Lowry Governance Group Member 13/05/2017
Sarah Wood Treasurer 20/06/2015
Jessica Ducey Governance Group Member 1/01/2015
Kelly Dare Co Chair 1/01/2015
Freya Dean Co Chair 24/07/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Madeleine Ashton-Martyn Governance Group Member 30/06/2018
Stephanie Rodgers Governance Group member 1/05/2018
Lorraine Melvin Treasurer 31/07/2017
Eleanor Butterworth Agency Manager 30/10/2016
Rose Melvin - 29/08/2016
Alarna Sharratt Governance Group Member 28/07/2016
Alarna Sharratt Governance Group Member 28/07/2016
Liz Robinson Governance Group Member 1/01/2016
Moana Sinclair Governance Group Member 1/01/2016
Nicole Skews - 1/01/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/07/2018 NOC013
30/09/2015 NOC010
26/02/2014 NOC009
24/09/2013 AR007
23/07/2012 AR006
7/03/2012 NOC003
14/10/2010 AR004
15/10/2009 AR003
4/11/2008 AR002
13/06/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents