pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Marlborough Civic Theatre Trust
ASB Theatre Marlborough
CC20702
9429042759232
Registered

Registration details

27/01/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 163
Blenheim
7240
2 Hutcheson Street
Blenheim 7201
Blenheim
7201

Charity's other details

(03)5208564
Facebook icon image
ASB Theatre Marlborough


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Marlborough Civic Theatre Trust works to grow a viable and dynamic community owned arts and theatre centre for the people of Marlborough. Providing an environment, in which the diversity and skills can be nurtured, encoraged and celebrated while striving for excellence.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The Trust is made up of Six Trustees - Two are appointed by the Appointment Committee from nominations made by local user groups and four appointed by the Appointment Committee with the proviso that at lease one of those members must have recognized accounting or financial skills.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/08 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/09.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 18/10/2018 $4,280,292 $1,925,218
31/12/2017 3/10/2017 $5,189,609 $1,759,329
31/12/2016 30/11/2016 $2,596,687 $1,459,892
31/12/2015 17/11/2015 $2,472,544 $726,255
31/12/2014 25/11/2014 $5,531,437 $1,450,047
31/12/2013 21/11/2013 $3,510,959 $714,245
31/12/2012 7/12/2012 $903,365 $736,504
31/12/2011 17/11/2011 $1,388,219 $706,151
31/12/2010 16/11/2010 $946,803 $667,659
31/12/2009 22/09/2009 $838,284 $755,358

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sara Bishell Trustee 18/12/2018
Gregory Cecil Simpson Trustee 9/05/2018
Anton Lance James Treasurer 22/11/2016
Brent Leslie Marshall Trustee 11/11/2014
Kevin Ronald Moseley Chairman 28/01/2008
Peter Mark Trustee 28/01/2008
Timothy John Leslie Trustee 28/01/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Larry James McFadden Trustee 9/05/2018
Nicholas Fulton Trustee 22/11/2016
Christopher Mitchell Treasurer 10/11/2016
Christopher Mitchell Treasurer 11/11/2014
Brian George Dawson Trustee 15/10/2013
Brian John Nicholas N/A 10/11/2010
Patrick John Rodgers N/A 5/08/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/05/2018 NOC012
25/11/2016 NOC009
13/11/2014 NOC008
22/01/2014 NOC007
16/11/2010 AR003
3/12/2009 NOC003

Charity Documents