pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Earthlink Incorporated
CC44122
9429042697404
Registered

Registration details

4/05/2010
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 40886
Upper Hutt
5140
25 Peterkin Street
Taita
Lower Hutt
5019

Charity's other details

04 567 7111
04 567 7114
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/EarthlinkIncorporated/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Earthlink registered as an Incorporated Society in 1995 with a mission to provide vocational and paid employment opportunities to people coping with Health and Social barriers to employment. This was after de-institutionalisation within the mental health sector, a time when “sheltered workshops” were the only option for many clients reintegrating into society. Earthlink gained PTE status in 2000 and became a registered Charity in 2010. Earthlink has worked towards creating sustainable business models to ensure it is able to pay at least minimum wage to all client/staff employed within its business units – this was one of the first such initiatives nationally and our policy has not changed in 20 years of operation.Earthlink supports 177-200 clients annually in vocational participation, workforce development and paid employment opportunities. Helping to maintain clients personal wellbeing and at the same time strengthening and supporting family/Whanau unity and the wider community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides Support, Counseling, Employment,Training)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Social services, Employment

People with disabilities

Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Developing a vocational and social enterprise model has enabled Earthlink to work towards financial independence and enter into contracts and partnerships with the private and commercial sector, thus supporting Government, community funding and sponsorships that are invaluable to our organisation Earthlink since 2002 has effectively resourced and ethically disposed of approximately 7000 tonne of end of life product contributing in a small way to the environmental sustainability of our planet.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2011.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 9/10/2019 $1,318,138 $1,230,919
31/03/2019 31/07/2019 $1,244,202 $1,312,674
31/12/2017 12/02/2018 $1,189,973 $1,200,630
31/12/2016 13/03/2017 Restricted Restricted Restricted Restricted
31/12/2015 7/08/2016 $1,074,592 $1,069,519
31/12/2014 15/06/2016 $1,105,149 $1,053,219
31/12/2013 23/01/2014 $1,022,000 $989,459
31/12/2012 5/07/2013 $1,086,516 $1,021,048
31/12/2011 13/04/2012 $944,848 $985,090
31/12/2010 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bruce McPhail Chairperson 26/09/2019
Natascha Lynn Wright Executive Board Member 2/07/2019
Graham Clarke Executive Board Member 20/03/2019
Riaz Dean Vice Chair 29/10/2016
Shawn Manders Executive Board Member 29/10/2016
Chris Ellis Chief Executive Officer 1/10/2012
Julie Englebretsen Executive Board Member 22/04/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Philip Caulfield Executive Board Member 26/09/2019
Bruce McPail Chairperson 25/09/2019
Rayna Deadman Executive Board Member 28/02/2019
Neville Bates Executive Board Member 27/09/2018
Shirley Nyla Cressey Chief Executive Officer 18/02/2018
Ian Shields Executive Board Co -Chairperson 21/09/2017
Robert Dodge Executive Board Secretary 21/09/2017
Wayne Fisk Executive Board Member 29/09/2016
Ian Demanser Executive Board Member 1/10/2015
James Philllip Richmond Executive Board Member 1/10/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/04/2019 NOC011
8/04/2019 NOC010
23/04/2018 NOC009
23/04/2018 NOC008
29/09/2016 NOC004
23/01/2014 NOC003
19/06/2013 NOC001
13/04/2012 AR002

Charity Documents