pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Life Unlimited Charitable Trust
Life Unlimited
CC26090
9429042665564
Registered

Registration details

17/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 146
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
20 Palmerston Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 8395506
07 8349982
Facebook icon image
LifeUnlimitedNZ
Linkedin:LifeunlimitedNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust provides a range of health and disability services, advice and equipment, both regionally and nationally. The Trust is a not for profit organisation committed to enhancing wellbeing by enabling people to live the life they choose. Services are funded by the Ministry of Heath, the Ministry of Social Development, and directly by Life Unlimited.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Life Unlimited Charitable Trust is a Charitable Trust registered under the Incorporated Societies Act 1908 and the Charitable Trust Act 1957. The Trust is domiciled in New Zealand.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 17/10/2018 $8,140,267 $8,270,068
31/12/2017 5/12/2017 $8,796,439 $8,848,599
31/12/2016 28/10/2016 $8,577,417 $8,555,589
31/12/2015 7/12/2015 $8,354,048 $8,336,593
31/12/2014 25/11/2014 $7,856,614 $7,895,291
31/12/2013 2/12/2013 $6,596,784 $6,628,172
31/12/2012 6/12/2012 $6,610,194 $6,514,108
31/12/2011 2/12/2011 $6,633,971 $6,634,943
31/12/2010 1/03/2011 $6,612,729 $6,277,566
31/12/2009 22/12/2009 $6,608,633 $6,243,932

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tiffiney Perry Trustee 31/07/2017
Anthea Simcock Trustee 31/01/2012
Lindsay Cumberpatch Trustee 29/11/2011
Bruce William Tocker Trustee 30/07/1979
John Robert Dobson Trustee 30/07/1979

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Smith Trustee 30/05/2017
Shirley Frances Wright Trustee 26/04/2011
Wayne Andrew Tukoroirangi Mclean Trustee 25/05/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/08/2017 NOC010
27/07/2017 NOC009
27/11/2014 NOC007
1/02/2012 NOC003
2/12/2011 AR005
27/06/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents