pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Pam Fergusson Charitable Trust
OMGTech!
CC51326
9429043268269
Registered

Registration details

23/12/2014
March 31

Address for service

14 Watene Road
Mount Wellington
Auckland
1060
Floor 4
165 The Strand
Parnell
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

0274971234
Facebook icon image
facebook.com/OMGTechRangers
Twitter icon image
twitter.com/OMGTechRangers


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To advance education in the application of technology; to raise awareness, interest, & encourage young people in the pursuit of learning & careers in technology by: - Designing & delivering programmes for schools; - Providing scholarships to facilitate young people's attendance at educational programmes; - Facilitating events, projects & activities that promote technology, technological learning & achievements; - Working with local & central government agencies & other interested bodies to develop policies & programmes; - Providing mentoring, training, counselling, equipment, & other appropriate assistance.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Facilitating Events Promoting Technological Learning

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Entity Structure

The trust currently has 3 trustees whom are appointed by our trust Settlor. The Trust employees one full time General Manager for 40 hours a week. The trust contracts to contractors on a project's basis. The Trust has an advisory group made up of the founders of the OMGTech! Project. The trust also has an Advisory group consisting of our industry specialists & volunteer representatives.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2017 5/09/2018 $347,885 $205,576
30/09/2016 20/07/2017 $121,906 $90,734
30/09/2015 17/11/2015 $14,610 $14,610

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Zoe Lana Timbrell General Manager 14/09/2015
Jonathan Fergusson Trustee 4/11/2014
Shawn Fergusson Trustee 4/11/2014
Vaughan Rowsell Trustee 4/11/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michelle Dickinson Founder 4/10/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/10/2016 NOC003
17/11/2015 NOC002
17/09/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents