pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Computers for Special Needs Trust
CC25877
9429042665038
Registered

Registration details

15/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 19957
Woolston
Christchurch
8241

Charity's other details

027 507-2853


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We promote and support the use of computer technology to assist people with special needs

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The organisation is governed by a Board of Trustees Committee which meets regularly. Day-to-day operation of the organisation is handled by an appointed coordinator.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 9/11/2018 $15,045 $12,567
30/09/2017 5/01/2018 $15,204 $11,096
30/09/2016 17/11/2016 $39,255 $36,018
30/09/2015 27/05/2015 $40,641 $41,685
30/09/2014 14/08/2014 $29,848 $32,816
30/09/2013 8/05/2013 $33,980 $35,058
30/09/2012 10/05/2012 $51,724 $48,626
30/09/2011 7/08/2011 $46,340 $45,167
30/09/2010 6/08/2010 $43,219 $48,283
30/09/2009 28/07/2008 $38,760 $33,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nicholas Schumacher Trustee 11/06/2016
Peter McGlinchey Trustee 31/05/2014
Michael Gordon Minute Secretary 28/01/2006
Barrie Morton Woods Chairperson 20/06/1996

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Douglas Alexander Schumacher Treasurer 8/03/2016
Avril Harper Secretary 9/10/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/01/2018 NOC016
26/10/2016 NOC013
11/11/2015 NOC011
17/12/2014 NOC010
31/05/2014 NOC009
8/05/2013 AR006
15/10/2011 NOC004
15/02/2010 NOC003
9/11/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents