pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Whare Pounamu Dunedin Women's Refuge Incorporated
CC25235
9429042827757
Registered

Registration details

3/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 2267
South Dunedin
Dunedin
9044
Restricted

Charity's other details

(03)4663220


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Te Whare Pounamu Dunedin Women's Refuge works to liberate women, children and whanau from family violence by providing quality services and social commentary.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Family Violence Respite care

Other (please state)

(Women and children)

Entity Structure

Affiliated to the National Collective of Independent Women's Refuges.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 20/12/2020 $1,031,002 $653,760
29/02/2020 2/03/2020 $844,366 $653,152
31/12/2018 19/11/2018 $723,600 $595,314
31/12/2017 5/12/2017 $647,649 $548,682
31/12/2016 14/12/2016 $647,775 $517,745
31/12/2015 16/11/2015 $599,395 $555,462
31/12/2014 2/02/2015 $565,679 $538,146
31/12/2013 13/02/2014 $625,421 $516,800
31/12/2012 21/01/2013 $557,256 $749,064
31/12/2011 17/02/2012 $530,582 $688,839

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Latu Chair 17/11/2020
Darlene Catherine Matahaere Board Member 17/11/2020
Dianne Wood Treasurer 17/11/2020
Gill Brown Secretary 17/11/2020
Gillian Musuka Board Member 17/11/2020
Janelle Timmins Board Member 17/11/2020
Jo Schmelz Board Member 17/11/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christine Maxwell Chair Person 17/11/2020
Dee-Jay Collins Boardmember 17/11/2020
Donna Matahaere Atariki Boardmember 17/11/2020
Jennifer Redding Treasurer 17/11/2020
Tana-Lee Henare Secretary 17/11/2020
Ina Te Hau Moses Board Member 31/05/2020
Viena McKenzie Boardmember 16/10/2018
Ina Te Hou Moses Board Member 4/10/2016
Michael Ferrari Board Member 5/11/2014
Rob Tigeir Board Member 5/11/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/01/2021 NOC017
17/11/2015 NOC011
17/09/2015 NOC010
3/03/2015 NOC009
29/05/2014 NOC008
29/05/2014 NOC007
21/01/2013 AR006
8/06/2012 NOC003
17/02/2012 AR004
2/11/2010 AR003

Charity Documents