pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Wellington Girls' College Parents' Association Incorporated
CC45714
9429042894940
Deregistered
30/09/2020
The finances will be manged by the Finance Team of Maree Foster at Wellington Girls College

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$35,952
$217

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:

  • Retained as they are continuing to operate

Below are details of Wellington Girls' College Parents' Association Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

15/11/2010
December 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 30/09/2020 The charity is continuing to operate but does not want to be registered any longer
Registered 15/11/2010
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Welllington Girls College Parent Support Group Incorporated 16/11/2010
Wellington Girls' College Parents' Association Incorporated 8/11/2011

Address for service

c/- Wellington Girls' College
18 Pipitea Street
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
WGC Parents Association


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Please refer to the WGC Parents' Association Performance Report for the year ended 31 December 2018

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Please refer to the WGC Parents' Association Performance Report for the year ended 31 December 2018

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The first annual return due on the 30/06/2011 will cover less than six months after the charity is registered. For this reason the charity should be granted an exemption to filing their first annual return under s41 (1), and the first annual return will be due by the 30/06/2012.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2020 12/10/2020 $28,304 $25,418
30/06/2019 10/04/2019 $29,047 $20,169
30/06/2018 7/11/2018 $29,050 $27,391
30/06/2017 2/07/2017 $19,307 $13,768
30/06/2016 31/07/2016 $18,536 $11,686
30/06/2015 18/04/2015 $11,360 $15,761
30/06/2014 4/05/2014 $10,372 $9,249
30/06/2013 16/06/2013 $17,936 $34,145
30/06/2012 19/06/2012 $21,707 $19,102

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Marjory Brown Chair 12/03/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Patricia Evers Deputy Chair 30/09/2020
Rachel Brown Executive Committee Member 30/09/2020
Amanda Garnett Secretary 31/03/2020
Diane Kay Bradley Treasurer 31/03/2020
Nicole Wijngaarden Executive Committee Member 31/03/2020
Nicola Wills Chair 12/03/2019
Carolyn McLean Executive Committee Member 15/03/2018
Claire Callaghan Co-Secretary 15/03/2018
Jo Constable Executive Committee Member 15/03/2018
Karen Moreau Deputy Chair 15/03/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/07/2018 NOC015
31/07/2016 NOC013
27/04/2015 NOC012
27/04/2014 NOC011
14/10/2013 NOC009
14/10/2013 NOC008
13/06/2013 AR003
18/04/2013 NOC007
18/04/2013 NOC006
15/05/2012 AR002

Charity Documents