pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Ecological Society Incorporated
CC49759
9429043208760
Registered

Registration details

19/09/2013
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 5075
Papanui
Christchurch
8542
PO Box 5075
Edendale
Papanui
Christchurch
8542

Charity's other details

0274985513
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/nzecology/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/nzecology


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the society shall be to: 1) promote the study of ecology and the application of ecological knowledge and all of its aspects; 2) publish the New Zealand Journal of Ecology; 3) foster collaboration and communication amongst ecologists.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(Scientists), Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Animals, General public

Entity Structure

The Council shall consist of the following: (i) the President, Vice President, Treasurer, and Secretary (ii) The Immediate Past President (iii) Four Councillors elected at the Annual General Meeting PROVIDED that the councillors are financial members of the Society.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Barlow Fund (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Kauri Fund (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2020 4/07/2020 $195,361 $185,025
30/06/2019 28/06/2019 $144,379 $126,597
30/06/2018 8/11/2018 $47,074 $56,873
30/06/2017 13/11/2017 $103,419 $58,463
30/06/2016 4/07/2017 $77,706 $77,474
30/06/2015 29/09/2015 $53,940 $79,875
30/06/2014 9/03/2015 $73,144 $73,820

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sarah Wyse Councillor 29/06/2020
Catriona Meredith Olwen Macinnis-Ng Immediate Past President 3/12/2019
James Charles Russell Councillor 3/12/2019
Katherine Grace McAlpine Secretary 3/12/2019
Nicola Jean Day Councillor 3/12/2019
Kiri Joy Wallace Vice President 12/12/2017
Simon Hugh Moore Councillor 12/12/2017
Timothy Curran President 23/11/2015
Christopher Bycroft Treasurer 26/11/2013
George Perry Journal Editor 21/11/2012

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bruce Richard Burns Councillor 3/12/2019
Cate Macinnes-Ng Immediate Past President 3/12/2019
Clayson Howell Immediate Past President 3/12/2019
Rachel Elizabeth Nepia Councillor 3/12/2019
Karl-Friedrich Martin Bader Councillor 11/12/2018
Debra Wotton Councillor 12/12/2017
Fleur Maseyk Councillor 12/12/2017
Jamie Wood Councillor 12/12/2017
Sandra Anderson Secretary 12/12/2017
Laura Young Councillor 1/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/06/2020 NOC013
29/06/2020 NOC012
23/12/2019 NOC011
28/06/2019 NOC009
8/11/2018 NOC007
30/06/2016 NOC005
20/06/2016 NOC004
28/01/2016 NOC003
9/04/2015 NOC002
28/02/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents