pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Maoriland Charitable Trust
CC53677
9429043312504
Registered

Registration details

20/07/2016
May 31

Address for service

P.O Box 16
Otaki
Otaki
5512

Charity's other details

021810484
Facebook icon image
@maorilandfilm
Twitter icon image
@maorilandfilm

Oceania

Australia, Samoa, Tonga

Europe

Germany, Iceland


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Māoriland Charitable Trust operates the Māoriland Film Festival that is both a commercial and critical success. Over the past seven years it has grown to an internationally and nationally renown film festival. In October 2017 Māoriland Charitable Trust established the Māoriland Hub which operates on tikanga Māori principals. It is the income generator for the Māoriland Charitable Trust. The strategic plan for both the Māoriland Hub and the Māoriland Film Festival includes growing the social, economic and cultural opportunities and benefits for the town of Ōtaki. In 2019, the MCT’s Rangatahi (youth) Strategy aims to do the following: To give voice to our rangatahi and support their aspirations to understand and participate in the community. To provide opportunities to grow the creative talents of rangatahi in the Kāpiti Coast region. To identify professional and training opportunities for rangatahi within the Kāpiti Coast. To create future leaders for the MCT.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Runs and fundraises for Maoriland Film Festival and the Māoriland Hub, a multi purpose cinema and arts space in Ōtaki.)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Kakano Films Limited was set up as the legal entity to deliver Māoriland Film Festival Registration number: CC53441 Maoriland charitable Trust has now been set up as the new entity for both the Maoriland Film Festival and the Māoriland Hub. We have 4 Trustees and are based in Otaki. The Trust is significantly guided by the principals tikanga of manaakitanga (hospitality) tino rangatiratanga (self determination), kotahitanga (collectiveness) and whanaungatanga.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2019 24/10/2019 $702,079 $647,581
30/11/2018 17/09/2018 $531,653 $386,054
30/09/2017 6/11/2017 $165,022 $11,359

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Graham Wiremu Trustee 4/05/2018
Deidre Ann McDonald Trustee 1/05/2018
John Barrett Chair 18/07/2016
Tania Hakaraia Trustee 18/07/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tainui Stephens Chair 1/05/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/05/2018 NOC005
4/05/2018 NOC004
14/11/2017 NOC003

Charity Documents