pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Revolve Rotorua
CC51688
N/A
Registered

Registration details

13/04/2015
March 31

Address for service

26 Charles Road
Hannahs Bay
Rotorua
3010

Charity's other details

0274146157


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Is to provide a range of group ride and events within the community that encourage and enhance women's participation in cycling.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Cycling Club)

Sport / recreation

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

A Management Committee of between 2 and 7 persons. Consisting of a Chairperson, and any additional officers the committee deems necessary for the progress of the organisation.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 29/04/2018 $9,007 $6,736
30/09/2017 3/07/2017 $12,197 $11,792
30/09/2016 23/06/2016 $13,199 $8,696

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gayle Anne Newman Treasurer 1/03/2019
Carey Bennett Committee Member 26/04/2018
Lisa Fraser Committee Member 26/04/2018
Alana Miller Committee Member 22/06/2017
Leisa Tocknell President 22/06/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Edith Klostermann Committee Member 1/03/2019
Martina Katipa Treasurer 1/03/2019
Erin Coull-Roberts President 26/04/2018
Gayle Anne Newman Treasurer 26/04/2018
Raewyn Sue Kilgour Committee Member 26/04/2018
Melanie Schuler Committee Member 26/02/2018
Sue Kinsella Committee Meeting 26/02/2018
Agnes Arnold Co-President 21/06/2017
Nadia Coombe Co-President 21/06/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/06/2018 NOC006

Charity Documents