pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of IHC New Zealand.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Accessible Properties New Zealand Limited
Choices New Zealand Limited
Idea Services Limited
IHC New Zealand Incorporated

Group Details


IHC New Zealand

Registration details

Registered
2/04/2008
CC22473
June 30

Address for service

c/- Duncan Cotterill
PO Box 10376
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
c/- Duncan Cotterill, Level 2
50 Customhouse Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Group's other details

(04)4722247
(04)4720429


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2019 19/12/2019 $339,048 $356,554
31/12/2018 24/10/2018 $331,249,000 $324,000,000
31/12/2017 8/02/2018 $300,290,000 $296,568,000
31/12/2016 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.
31/12/2015 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.
31/12/2014 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.
31/12/2013 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.
31/12/2012 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.
31/12/2011 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

IHC advocates for the rights, inclusions and welfare of all people with intellectual disability and others in need and supports them to lead satisfying lives in the community. This includes providing services including, but not limited to vocational, residential and support services, the provision of housing, property and property management services, counselling, social work and administration, medical treatment and support.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, borrows funds

People with disabilities

Accommodation / housing, Social services, Employment, Disability, Vocational

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Children / young people

Entity Structure

Accessible Properties Limited and Idea Services Limited are limited liability companies that are wholly owned subsidiaries of IHC New Zealand Incorporated (a registered incorporated society)

Group Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this group.

Group Documents