Use this to find information about a particular charity.
Charity Summary
Charity Details
Registration details
Name change history
Name | Effective Date |
---|---|
New Zealand Book Council | 15/08/2007 |
The New Zealand Book Council Incorporated | 3/07/2018 |
Read NZ Te Pou Muramura Incorporated | 9/09/2019 |
Address for service
Charity's other details
Purpose & Structure
Charitable Purpose
Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.
(We lead, support, facilitate and deliver programmes and initiatives that build a strong reading-for-pleasure culture in Aotearoa.)
Education / training / research, Community development
Children/Family/Young people
Entity Structure
Annual Returns
Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.
Exemptions
This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.
Officer Details
Officers
Past Officers
Charity Updates
Charity Documents
Date Uploaded | Document Type | Reference Name |
---|
No supporting documents.