pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Presbyterian Support (Upper South Island)
CC21765
9429042808664
Registered

Registration details

12/03/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 13171
Armagh
Christchurch
8141
Unit 4
25 Churchill Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

(03)3665472
(03)3796235


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Presbyterian Support (Upper South Island) (PSUSI) is incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957 and the Charities Act 2005. PSUSI is domiciled and registered in New Zealand and is primarily involved in the provision of social services. For the purposes of complying with generally accepted accounting practices in New Zealand (“NZ GAAP”), PSUSI is a public benefit entity.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Religious activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Presbyterian Support is a charitable trust with offices in the upper south island.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 30/10/2018 $7,594,314 $10,192,807
31/12/2017 21/11/2017 $9,422,374 $11,594,652
31/12/2016 22/11/2016 $9,799,756 $11,519,478
31/12/2015 23/11/2015 $14,793,000 $11,867,000
31/12/2014 27/11/2014 $12,261,000 $11,273,000
31/12/2013 22/01/2014 $11,599,000 $10,342,000
31/12/2012 26/11/2012 $13,027,000 $10,414,000
31/12/2011 20/12/2011 $10,758,000 $10,308,000
31/12/2010 5/11/2010 $9,871,000 $9,956,000
31/12/2009 9/12/2009 $9,624,000 $9,996,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrew Barry Thompson Trustee 25/10/2018
Ian James, Love Lothian Trustee 25/10/2018
Philippa Ranby Trustee 25/10/2018
David Fisher Trustee 28/06/2018
Hanseong Jee Trustee 7/02/2018
Blair Stirling Trustee 5/10/2016
Julie Moor Trustee 6/07/2016
Sharyn Lee Roberts Trustee 1/10/2014
Andrew Bertram Souness Trustee 30/11/2010
Christine Helen Darling Trustee 20/10/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Thomas William Withers Trustee 25/10/2018
Margaret Anne Bigsby Trustee 25/10/2018
Patricia Hilda Matunga Trustee 25/10/2018
Elizabeth Mabel Campbell Trustee 26/10/2017
Graham Bruce Robertson Board Member 26/10/2017
John Charles McKean Trustee 31/12/2016
Bronwyn Isabel Welsh Trustee 22/10/2015
Donald George Church Trustee 1/10/2014
John Crosbie Simpson Trustee 1/10/2014
Patricia Anne Edward Trustee 30/11/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/07/2018 NOC012
17/07/2018 NOC011
31/10/2016 NOC007
4/03/2016 NOC006
26/11/2012 AR005
5/04/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents