pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Mount Albert Grammar School Foundation
CC46943
9429042751564
Registered

Registration details

4/10/2011
March 31

Address for service

Mt Albert Grammar School
36 Alberton Avenue
Mount Albert
Auckland
1025

Charity's other details

09 815 4032


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Makes grants and loans to individuals and Mount Albert Grammar school.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Education / training / research

Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Family / whanau, Students

Entity Structure

Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2012 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2013.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 31/10/2019 $842,963 $461,276
31/10/2018 17/10/2018 $600,130 $607,859
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $721,678 $730,677
30/09/2016 8/12/2016 $540,179 $274,797
30/09/2015 7/01/2016 $501,101 $418,493
30/09/2014 17/10/2014 $193,187 $233,573
30/09/2013 31/10/2013 $95,956 $62,107
30/09/2012 11/09/2013 $83,079 $93,102

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Aftab Moosa Trustee 30/11/2017
John Laurence Liddell Trustee 1/12/2016
Patrick Dennis Drumm Trustee 18/11/2016
Peter Herbert Thorp Trustee 1/04/2015
Gregory James Moyle Trustee 1/02/2008
Grant Stephen Watson Trustee 1/02/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
George Gregory Taylor Trustee 1/12/2016
Timothy John Goulding Trustee 1/12/2016
Dale Michael Burden Trustee 18/11/2016
Dale John Griffiths Trustee 31/03/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/04/2018 NOC005
10/06/2015 NOC002
12/05/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents


Notices

The trustees agree that as a condition of their registration and in accordance with section 61B of the Charitable Trust Act 1957 , that the trust deed will be given effect as if assistance provided to teachers for accommodation is limited to those teachers at or proposing to teach at the school during the term of their engagement with the school under clause 3(h). Further, the trustees are constrained to doing all such further or other things as considered desirable for the advancement and promotion of the Mount Albert Grammar School, its teachers and pupils only, under clause 3(o). Finally, that the functions, powers and duties of the trustees under clause 5(c) and 5(e) shall be restricted to those that further the charitable purposes of the trust.