pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

MUSLIM COUNCIL OF AUCKLAND BURIAL SOCIETY INCORPORATED
MCABS
CC54420
9429045979804
Deregistered
05/07/2019
The society intends to pay dividends on investments of the society's funds to its members and therefore does not qualify to be a charity

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$88,000
$0

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:

  • Retained as they are continuing to operate

Below are details of MUSLIM COUNCIL OF AUCKLAND BURIAL SOCIETY INCORPORATED at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

3/05/2017
March 31

Address for service

131 Redoubt Road
Goodwood Heights
Auckland
2105

Charity's other details

09 26261635
09 2621685


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

to provide financial assistance to poor and needy and members for burial expenses.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Religious activities

Religious groups

General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

It is an incorporated society with membership. It will have a Board and Council.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 20/08/2018 $50,000 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jafar Ali Officer 21/08/2018
Ahmed Bhamji Board Member 1/03/2017
HAIDER Lone Board member 1/03/2017
Mohammad Amir Board Member 1/03/2017
Mohammed Atik Board Member 1/03/2017
Mohammed Azeem Board member 1/03/2017
Mohammed Faiyaz Board member 1/03/2017
Mohammed Zaved Iqbal Khan Board Member 1/03/2017
Mohammed Azeem Khan Board member 1/03/2017
Mohammed Rasheed Board member 1/03/2017

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents