pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Nextstage Theatre Charitable Trust
CC54001
9429043294244
Registered

Registration details

25/06/2016
March 31

Address for service

19 Ravi Street
Khandallah
Wellington
6035

Charity's other details

0274806209


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To foster, develop and encourage all forms of creative and performing art, including without limitation, theatre, music, dance, writing and visual art, in a manner that benefits the community.The provision of artistic, cultural and theatrical training and/or education programmes that assist with the development of students of any age at schools, training institutes and other places of learning; and The provision of any other charitable purpose that promotes or furthers the discipline of physical

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Theatre company)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust.The only trading activities will be the staging of theatre performances and the costs associated with those.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 28/11/2018 $61,377 $68,805
30/09/2017 28/11/2018 $17,544 $7,194

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Robert Rowell Secretary, Trustee 21/05/2018
Anna Maria Geremia-Young Trustee 7/11/2017
John Parker Trustee 6/12/2016
Dianne Jean Armstrong Trustee 9/03/2016
Susan Angela Avison Chairperson 26/09/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anthony Doornebosch Trustee/Treasurer 1/06/2018
Arini Georgia Gray Poutu Trustee 25/01/2017
Alister John Skene Trustee 14/12/2016
Julie Heather Reddish Trustee 16/11/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
2/08/2018 NOC003
15/11/2017 NOC002
30/01/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents