pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Lantern House Trust
CC43218
N/A
Registered

Registration details

20/12/2009
June 30

Address for service

41 Richmond Street
Fitzroy
New Plymouth
4312

Charity's other details

0274776951


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Lantern House Trust is a charity set up to provide housing for young people of Taranaki with both mental and physical disabilities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Housing

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Health, Support for intellectually disabled; Housing for intelectually disabled

People with disabilities

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Lantern House Trust consists of the following board structure: Chairman - Andy Hay, Trustees - Mr Andy Hay, Mrs Sheri Hay, Mr Roger landers, Mrs Julie Landers and Mrs Bev Gibson

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2019 3/01/2020 $45,965 $19,355
31/12/2018 23/12/2018 $48,855 $7,321
31/12/2017 24/04/2018 $46,737 $12,990
31/12/2016 7/12/2016 $53,460 $8,782
31/12/2015 24/11/2015 $49,810 $3,491
31/12/2014 7/02/2015 $30,126 $2,801
31/12/2013 12/02/2014 $26,312 $5,991
31/12/2012 10/11/2012 $54,491 $15,043
31/12/2011 22/12/2011 $14,726 $2,430

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Beverley Anne Gibson Trustee 30/03/2015
Julie Landers Trustee 10/10/2012
Roger Landers Trustee 10/10/2012
Andrew Edward Hay Trustee 1/11/2009
Sheri Hay Trustee 1/11/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Clinton Nel Trustee 10/05/2016
Heidi Elizabeth Griffin Trustee 10/10/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/11/2015 NOC004
8/10/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents