pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Biological Husbandry Unit Organics Trust
CC44519
9429042983101
Registered

Registration details

27/06/2010
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 69113
Lincoln
7640
Farm Road
Lincoln University
Lincoln
Christchurch
7640

Charity's other details

03 325 3684
03 325 3864


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To Promote the development and education of organic horticulture in New Zealand by the way of the provision of resources to organisations and members of the public, such resources include; Education and Training, Research & Development & Consultancy Services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Organic Education, Research & Extension activities.)

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation, Community development, Employment

General public

Entity Structure

The Biological Husbandry Unit Organic Trust is a trust established and domiciled in New Zealand by Trust deed. The Biological Husbandry Unit Organic Trust is engaged in Organic Education, Horticulture and Research

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 6/12/2020 $764,879 $379,524
31/12/2019 19/11/2019 $184,850 $248,322
31/12/2018 13/12/2018 $296,899 $325,508
31/12/2017 21/08/2018 $432,933 $433,456
31/12/2016 24/04/2017 $485,509 $487,186
31/12/2015 27/01/2016 $270,431 $243,189
31/12/2014 25/05/2015 $300,847 $246,343
31/12/2013 24/05/2015 $380,624 $375,384
31/12/2012 14/12/2012 $309,687 $260,623
31/12/2011 21/12/2011 $187,390 $140,912

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Preston Bailey Peryman Trustee 5/11/2018
Lorraine Petelo Trustee 5/02/2018
Lynne Johnston Trustee 19/11/2012
Stephen Wratten Trustee 1/06/2007
Jonathon Bruce Manhire Chairman 17/05/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Manaia Cunningham Trustee 3/09/2018
Michael Daly Trustee 30/01/2018
David Musgrave Trustee 1/12/2017
Matthew Morris Board member 29/09/2016
Sheelagh Matear Trustee 12/02/2016
Jon Tanner Trustee 1/11/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/05/2013 NOC003
21/12/2011 AR002
9/11/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents